U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00237
  • Case Name: Greenwood v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 14, 2020: [Stipulation]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 02, 2019: [Stay]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Reply]
  • November 15, 2019: [Reply]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • October 28, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • October 28, 2019: [Stay]
  • October 25, 2019: [Leave]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 15, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 01, 2019: [Status Report]
  • October 01, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 30, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • September 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • September 16, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • September 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 13, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • September 10, 2019: [Leave]
  • September 03, 2019: [Leave]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 16, 2019: [Errata]
  • August 15, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • August 02, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 01, 2019: [Expedite]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Expedite]
  • July 30, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.