U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Gillespie v. Endeavor Air, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 09, 2020: [Stipulation]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • September 13, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 26, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 20, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 19, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2019: [Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.