U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cv-02042
  • Case Name: Buck et al v. Baus et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Extension of Time]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 04, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 15, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 14, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • August 13, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Continue Trial]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.