U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Norberg et al v. Menard, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 28, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • September 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 16, 2020: [Closing Documents]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 18, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 11, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 11, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 09, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Errata]
  • September 05, 2019: [Errata]
  • September 05, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 03, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 13, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 12, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.