U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00020
  • Case Name: Morehouse v. Ameristar Casino Council Bluffs, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 16, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 08, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 22, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice - Other]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 19, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 05, 2019: [Status Report]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 02, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 19, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • August 13, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.