U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00253
  • Case Name: Angle Hans Enterprises, L.C. v. Federated Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 25, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • March 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 03, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • March 03, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 01, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 26, 2019: [Status Report]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 06, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • August 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 14, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 14, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 14, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 14, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.