U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00259
  • Case Name: Henning Construction Company, LLC v. Amerisure Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 08, 2021: [Stipulation]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • December 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 19, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 18, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 04, 2020: [Status Report]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 05, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 31, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 30, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 27, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • March 27, 2020: [Leave]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 13, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 05, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 23, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 22, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 22, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 21, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.