U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00258
  • Case Name: Lemon v. Iowa State Patrol et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 17, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 17, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 19, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • December 19, 2019: [Add Party]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 20, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.