U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Flannery v. Advantage Workers Compensation Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 15, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • December 02, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • December 02, 2020: [Status Report]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [Status Report]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Stay]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 03, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.