U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00269
  • Case Name: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Roam One, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 08, 2020: [Stipulation]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Status Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 24, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 15, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 02, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • September 04, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.