U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Holt v. Milan Laser Corporate LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 23, 2019: [Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Status Report]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 29, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 22, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 10, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 26, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 17, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 03, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.