U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00267
  • Case Name: Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. 3G Homes LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • January 06, 2021: [Leave]
  • January 05, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 07, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • December 07, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 24, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 23, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 23, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 09, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • November 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Bifurcate/Sever]
  • October 14, 2020: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • October 14, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 13, 2020: [Sealed Document]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sealed Document]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 16, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 23, 2020: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • June 08, 2020: [Bifurcate/Sever]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • May 28, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 27, 2020: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
  • May 22, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 07, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • May 07, 2020: [Intervenor Complaint]
  • May 01, 2020: [Bifurcate/Sever]
  • May 01, 2020: [Remand to State Court]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Intervene]
  • April 16, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 16, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 30, 2020: [Third Party Complaint]
  • March 27, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 26, 2020: [Leave]
  • March 26, 2020: [Add Party]
  • March 26, 2020: [Intervene]
  • March 26, 2020: [Intervenor Complaint]
  • March 16, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • March 15, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2020: [Errata]
  • March 08, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 08, 2020: [Counterclaim]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • January 30, 2020: [Leave]
  • January 16, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 17, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 06, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 14, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • November 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 30, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 23, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • September 04, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.