U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00263
  • Case Name: Fareway Stores, Inc. v Adlife Marketing & Communication Co., Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Report regarding Copyright]
  • February 25, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 23, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 22, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 21, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 07, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • October 07, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.