U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00279
  • Case Name: National Biodiesel Board v. Hull Partners, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 23, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 09, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 04, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 04, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 04, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 25, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 11, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 06, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.