U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00277
  • Case Name: BNSF Railway Company v. United Metallurgical Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • October 19, 2020: [Declaration]
  • October 07, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • September 23, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 16, 2020: [Leave]
  • September 01, 2020: [Reply]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Leave]
  • August 26, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • August 24, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 12, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 11, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 11, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 10, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 23, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 16, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Status Report]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Status Report]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 17, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 19, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • December 18, 2019: [Leave]
  • December 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 04, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 18, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • September 06, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 06, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.