U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00281
  • Case Name: Hillock v Swenson. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • February 21, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sealed Document]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 23, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 21, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 21, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • January 20, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • January 17, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 13, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • December 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.