U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-01022
  • Case Name: Cunningham v. Prairie Farms Dairy, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 03, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 26, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 12, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 23, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 01, 2019: [Seal]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • September 06, 2019: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.