U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00286
  • Case Name: Stout v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice - Other]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 08, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 08, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2020: [Errata]
  • October 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Remand to Agency]
  • June 05, 2020: [Status Report]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Stay]
  • May 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2020: [Stay]
  • May 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 27, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 27, 2020: [Stay]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • November 22, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 06, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.