U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Al Herz v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Case Ready for Decision]
  • July 26, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 20, 2022: [Sanctions]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 27, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 27, 2021: [Expedite]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Expedite]
  • March 30, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.