U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00289
  • Case Name: Carver v. Pederson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 19, 2020: [Closing Documents]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 04, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 02, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 02, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 25, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 19, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 28, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 26, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 11, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 10, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.