U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00142
  • Case Name: EFCO Corp v. Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • November 12, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 12, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 11, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 10, 2020: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 10, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 10, 2020: [Trial Brief]
  • November 06, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • October 23, 2020: [In Limine]
  • October 06, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Errata]
  • September 02, 2020: [Affidavit]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Joinder]
  • August 31, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 27, 2020: [Errata]
  • August 24, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 24, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • August 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 04, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 03, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 03, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 03, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 15, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [Errata]
  • July 09, 2020: [Protective Order]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • December 11, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 14, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 07, 2019: [Status Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 16, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.