U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00300
  • Case Name: WILLIAMS IV et al v. DAVE WRIGHT BHG, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 15, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 18, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 17, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.