U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:18-cv-02089
  • Case Name: Brandes Sr v. City of Waterloo Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 21, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 03, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 03, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • November 19, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.