U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00306
  • Case Name: Turner v Midwest Hospitality, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • February 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order]
  • January 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Status Report]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 02, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 04, 2019: [Dismiss]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 22, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 01, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 25, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.