U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00305
  • Case Name: Embry v 4745 Second Ave, LTD., et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • January 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 18, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
  • September 18, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 18, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • September 01, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Certify Class]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 02, 2020: [Reply]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 11, 2020: [Declaration]
  • June 11, 2020: [Certify Class]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 16, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order]
  • April 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • December 27, 2019: [Order]
  • December 27, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 20, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 12, 2019: [Reply]
  • November 07, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 05, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 28, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 22, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 22, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 26, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 25, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.