U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00069
  • Case Name: Buchanan v. Walmart Stores Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • June 18, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 08, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 08, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 23, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 27, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 27, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.