U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00068
  • Case Name: McCoy v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 08, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 23, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 10, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Alter Judgment]
  • May 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Alter Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • July 10, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 03, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • February 03, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 26, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.