U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00310
  • Case Name: Dobbins et al v. Jo-Ann Stores, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 18, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 18, 2021: [Jury Verdict]
  • February 18, 2021: [Exhibits Receipt]
  • February 18, 2021: [Witness List]
  • February 18, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • February 18, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 18, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 17, 2021: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 16, 2021: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • February 16, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 16, 2021: [Jury Challenge Sheet (Sealed)]
  • February 16, 2021: [Voir Dire]
  • February 08, 2021: [Witness List]
  • February 03, 2021: [Witness List]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Motion in Limine]
  • January 20, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 20, 2021: [Motion in Limine]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • January 06, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • January 04, 2021: [Declaration]
  • January 04, 2021: [Objections - Generic]
  • January 04, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 31, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 31, 2020: [Trial Brief]
  • December 31, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 31, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 23, 2020: [Transcript]
  • December 22, 2020: [Compel]
  • December 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 21, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 21, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • December 18, 2020: [In Limine]
  • December 18, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • December 18, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 16, 2020: [In Limine]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 10, 2020: [Compel]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Compel]
  • November 30, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 24, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 23, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 23, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 12, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 10, 2020: [Compel]
  • November 10, 2020: [In Limine]
  • November 10, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 03, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 02, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 21, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • August 10, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 10, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 30, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 29, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [Objections to Bill of Costs]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2020: [Declaration]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 29, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • June 12, 2020: [Declaration]
  • June 12, 2020: [Sanctions]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2020: [Compel]
  • May 19, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 07, 2020: [Declaration]
  • May 07, 2020: [Reply]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • April 22, 2020: [Declaration]
  • April 22, 2020: [Compel]
  • April 09, 2020: [Notice - Other]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 03, 2020: [Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • January 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 04, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 03, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.