U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:18-cv-02087
  • Case Name: Jones v. Wachtendorf et al - Set answer deadline 30 days after petitioner files his amended petition
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 18, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • December 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 16, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 04, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 04, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 03, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.