U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00323
  • Case Name: Des Moines Ironworkers Local No. 67 Pension Fund et al v. MPCC, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Notice - Other]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2020: [Closing Documents]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Certificate]
  • February 11, 2020: [Protective Order]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 06, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 21, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 06, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 05, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 01, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • October 08, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 07, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.