U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00327
  • Case Name: Rasmusson v. Monsanto Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 15, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 08, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 08, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.