U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00073
  • Case Name: Derr v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 07, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 07, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • November 01, 2019: [Remand to State Court]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 09, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.