U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00329
  • Case Name: SRA Insurance Agency, LLC v. Woock et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 10, 2020: [Permanent Injunction]
  • January 09, 2020: [Permanent Injunction]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Closing Documents]
  • December 11, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • November 22, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 22, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • November 20, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 13, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 05, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 29, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 25, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 22, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 22, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 16, 2019: [Expedite]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Expedite]
  • October 14, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • October 10, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • October 10, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 09, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 09, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.