U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Grant v. Zorn et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 14, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Cross Appeal]
  • December 01, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • October 24, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • October 13, 2022: [Brief /Other]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • February 01, 2022: [Brief /Other]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • January 19, 2022: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • January 18, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • January 18, 2022: [Witness List]
  • January 14, 2022: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • January 13, 2022: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • January 12, 2022: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • January 11, 2022: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • January 10, 2022: [Bench Trial - Begun]
  • January 10, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 07, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice - Other]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 14, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 26, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 25, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 23, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • March 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • March 18, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 18, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Strike]
  • March 04, 2021: [In Limine]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 12, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 09, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 08, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • February 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [In Limine]
  • January 22, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 06, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 05, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 04, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 28, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 28, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 23, 2020: [Strike]
  • December 23, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 23, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 17, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2020: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • December 08, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 08, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 07, 2020: [Compel]
  • December 07, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • December 04, 2020: [Leave]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 20, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 20, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • November 19, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 19, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 13, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 03, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 02, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 14, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 08, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 05, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 07, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [Protective Order]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 10, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 19, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 17, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 05, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 05, 2019: [Counterclaim]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.