U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00341
  • Case Name: Hoang v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 10, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.