U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00344
  • Case Name: Duran v. Beutler, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 17, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 12, 2021: [Compel]
  • February 10, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • February 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • February 08, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 02, 2021: [Leave]
  • February 02, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • February 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 01, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 18, 2021: [Compel]
  • January 05, 2021: [Errata]
  • January 05, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • January 04, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 04, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 04, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 10, 2020: [Compel]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 07, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 23, 2020: [Compel]
  • November 18, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Compel]
  • October 15, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 14, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 13, 2020: [Status Report]
  • October 13, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 13, 2020: [Statement]
  • October 09, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 09, 2020: [Compel]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 07, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 02, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 02, 2020: [Compel]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 30, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 24, 2020: [Compel]
  • July 14, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 07, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 16, 2020: [Compel]
  • June 10, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 27, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 26, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 19, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 05, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 10, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 30, 2020: [Errata]
  • March 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice - Other]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • January 30, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 27, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 26, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 04, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 04, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 28, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.