U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00346
  • Case Name: Roman v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice - Other]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.