U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00348
  • Case Name: Weiss-Kreps v. Wilkie
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • March 05, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • March 04, 2020: [Strike]
  • March 04, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 25, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 25, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • February 25, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 25, 2020: [Strike]
  • February 24, 2020: [Strike]
  • February 21, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 21, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • February 10, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 04, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sealed Document]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 27, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 06, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 30, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 30, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 29, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.