U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00356
  • Case Name: Beard v. Beard
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 17, 2020: [Transcript]
  • June 04, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 24, 2020: [Witness List]
  • April 23, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • April 22, 2020: [Witness List]
  • April 20, 2020: [Exhibit List]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 24, 2020: [Witness List]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
  • February 27, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 19, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 06, 2020: [Default Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 04, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 01, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.