U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00084
  • Case Name: Ismail v. United States Department of State et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • February 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 03, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.