U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00134
  • Case Name: Karg et al v. Transamerica Corporation et al SEE ORDER ON ATTNY FEES AT [25] WHEN FINAL JUDGMENT IS ENTERED
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 27, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2020: [Protective Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Certify Class]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 05, 2019: [Strike]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.