U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cv-02048
  • Case Name: Ceran v. Reisch et al--SEE #7 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO EMAIL DOCUMENTS TO CLERK FOR FILING
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 10, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 09, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Quash]
  • April 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 06, 2020: [Protective Order]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2020: [Compel]
  • March 11, 2020: [Compel]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 18, 2020: [Service by Publication]
  • February 11, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2020: [Protective Order]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Compel]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Compel]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Compel]
  • November 21, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 19, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • November 12, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 07, 2019: [Sanctions]
  • November 05, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.