U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00366
  • Case Name: Reed et al v. City of Des Moines
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Set Aside/Reconsider]
  • December 17, 2019: [Strike]
  • December 06, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 05, 2019: [Strike]
  • December 03, 2019: [Set Aside/Reconsider]
  • December 03, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 03, 2019: [Letter]
  • December 02, 2019: [Sanctions]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • December 02, 2019: [Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • November 21, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 21, 2019: [Sanctions]
  • November 20, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 20, 2019: [Remand to State Court]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.