U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00368
  • Case Name: Grice v. State of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Letter]
  • April 20, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.