U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00367
  • Case Name: Pryor v. Hagler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Mail Returned]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 25, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 15, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.