U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00372
  • Case Name: United States Department of Labor v. Ben Shinn Trucking, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Brief /Other]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Brief /Other]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Brief /Other]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Brief /Other]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Brief /Other]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Brief /Other]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Brief /Other]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Judgment - Consent]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Entry of Consent Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 06, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 18, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.