U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00300
  • Case Name: Williams IV et al v. Dave Wright BGH, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 03, 2021: [Stipulation]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • April 23, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 21, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 20, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • April 19, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 19, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • April 19, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 19, 2021: [Statement]
  • April 14, 2021: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • April 13, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • April 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 06, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 05, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • April 05, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 05, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Statement]
  • April 05, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [In Limine]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Quash]
  • December 09, 2020: [Reply]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 25, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 04, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Errata]
  • October 15, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 12, 2020: [Protective Order]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • September 11, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 01, 2020: [Reply]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • August 28, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 25, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 13, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 06, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 06, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 04, 2020: [Quash]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 16, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 14, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Protective Order]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 19, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 18, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 11, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 27, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 21, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 18, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.