U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Lambert v. City of Coralville, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • July 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 01, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2020: [Protective Order]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 24, 2020: [Status Report]
  • February 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 20, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • January 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 16, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 15, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 03, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 18, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.