U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00091
  • Case Name: InfinityUrns, L.L.C. v. Star India Crafts et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Report regarding Copyright]
  • March 03, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • February 25, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 24, 2020: [Status Report]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Report regarding Copyright]
  • December 03, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • December 02, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.