U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Finn v. Syneos Health US, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • March 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 18, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 17, 2021: [Leave]
  • February 17, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 11, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 04, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • February 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Errata]
  • January 04, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 04, 2021: [Brief /Other]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 31, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 31, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 17, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 17, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 16, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 16, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 16, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • November 16, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 16, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 16, 2020: [Seal]
  • November 13, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 13, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 13, 2020: [Seal]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Compel]
  • October 19, 2020: [Strike]
  • October 16, 2020: [Compel]
  • October 06, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 02, 2020: [Errata]
  • October 02, 2020: [Protective Order]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 14, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 10, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 09, 2020: [Protective Order]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Order]
  • April 06, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Protective Order]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 25, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.